Nicholas Collishaw
Chairman chez REDE HOTE
Fortune : 127 945 $ au 31/03/2024
Postes actifs de Nicholas Collishaw
Sociétés | Poste | Début | Fin |
---|---|---|---|
REDE HOTE | Chairman | 27/09/2018 | - |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 27/09/2018 | - | |
LENDLEASE GROUP | Director/Board Member | 01/12/2021 | - |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 01/12/2021 | - | |
Mirvac REIT Management Pty Ltd.
Mirvac REIT Management Pty Ltd. Real Estate Investment TrustsFinance Part of Mirvac Group, Mirvac REIT Management Pty Ltd. acts as a Real Estate Investment Trust/REIT. The private company is based in Sydney, Australia. | Corporate Officer/Principal | - | - |
Lincoln Place (Australia) | Director/Board Member | 01/01/2018 | - |
Founder | 01/01/2018 | - | |
Centuria Heathley Asset Management Ltd. | Director/Board Member | - | - |
The Royal Institution of Chartered Surveyors
The Royal Institution of Chartered Surveyors Miscellaneous Commercial ServicesCommercial Services The Royal Institution of Chartered Surveyors provides professional excellence in its membership through education, accreditation, publication, and other services. The non-profit company is based in London, UK, and has a global presence of subsidiaries in several regions. Justin Young has been the CEO of the British company since 2023. | Corporate Officer/Principal | - | - |
Redcape Hotel Group Pty Ltd.
Redcape Hotel Group Pty Ltd. Hotels/Resorts/Cruise linesConsumer Services Redcape Hotel Group Pty Ltd. owns and operates hotels. It offers food and beverage, gaming, accommodation, and functions The company is headquartered in Drummoyne, Australia. | Chairman | - | - |
Independent Dir/Board Member | - | - | |
Property Industry Foundation | Director/Board Member | 25/01/2011 | - |
Historique de carrière de Nicholas Collishaw
Anciens postes connus de Nicholas Collishaw
Sociétés | Poste | Début | Fin |
---|---|---|---|
CENTURIA CAPITAL GROUP | Director/Board Member | 27/08/2013 | 30/08/2021 |
Corporate Officer/Principal | 01/05/2013 | 01/10/2017 | |
░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | - | |
░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | - | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
░░░░░░ ░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | |
░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | - | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | - | |
░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | |
░░░░░░ ░░░░ ░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░ | ░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | - |
Statistiques
Internationale
Australie | 17 |
Royaume-Uni | 2 |
Opérationnelle
Director/Board Member | 12 |
Corporate Officer/Principal | 4 |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 3 |
Sectorielle
Finance | 11 |
Consumer Services | 3 |
Commercial Services | 2 |
Fonctions occupées
Actives
Inactives
Sociétés cotées
Entreprise privées
Sociétés liées
Sociétés cotées | 5 |
---|---|
MIRVAC GROUP | Finance |
CENTURIA CAPITAL GROUP | Finance |
LENDLEASE GROUP | Industrial Services |
CENTURIA INDUSTRIAL REIT | Finance |
CENTURIA OFFICE REIT | Finance |
Entreprise privées | 12 |
---|---|
James Fielding Group Ltd.
James Fielding Group Ltd. Real Estate DevelopmentFinance James Fielding Group provides corporate real estate, asset management, financial and lease management, facilities management, and transactional services. It also manages commercial, retail, and industrial assets, as well as listed property trusts, unlisted property funds, infrastructure funds, property securities, and property debt funds. The company is base in Sydney, Australia. | Finance |
Mirvac Real Estate Investment Trust
Mirvac Real Estate Investment Trust Real Estate Investment TrustsFinance Mirvac Real Estate Investment Trust provides diversified real estate investments services. The company was founded on September 29, 1999 is headquartered in Sydney, Australia. | Finance |
Mirvac REIT Management Pty Ltd.
Mirvac REIT Management Pty Ltd. Real Estate Investment TrustsFinance Part of Mirvac Group, Mirvac REIT Management Pty Ltd. acts as a Real Estate Investment Trust/REIT. The private company is based in Sydney, Australia. | Finance |
Austfunding Trust
Austfunding Trust Real Estate Investment TrustsFinance Austfunding Trust engages in property investment. The company was founded on march 31, 2005 and is headquartered in Sydney, Australia. | Finance |
The Royal Institution of Chartered Surveyors
The Royal Institution of Chartered Surveyors Miscellaneous Commercial ServicesCommercial Services The Royal Institution of Chartered Surveyors provides professional excellence in its membership through education, accreditation, publication, and other services. The non-profit company is based in London, UK, and has a global presence of subsidiaries in several regions. Justin Young has been the CEO of the British company since 2023. | Commercial Services |
Property Industry Foundation | |
Centuria Property Funds Ltd.
Centuria Property Funds Ltd. Real Estate DevelopmentFinance Part of Centuria Capital Group, Centuria Property Funds Ltd. is an Australian property management company. The private company is based in Sydney, Australia. The company was founded in 1999. Jason Christopher Huljich has been the CEO of the company since 1999. | Finance |
Redcape Hotel Group Pty Ltd.
Redcape Hotel Group Pty Ltd. Hotels/Resorts/Cruise linesConsumer Services Redcape Hotel Group Pty Ltd. owns and operates hotels. It offers food and beverage, gaming, accommodation, and functions The company is headquartered in Drummoyne, Australia. | Consumer Services |
Redcape Hotel Group Management Ltd.
Redcape Hotel Group Management Ltd. Hotels/Resorts/Cruise linesConsumer Services Redcape Hotel Group Management Ltd. engages in operating hotels. The firm engages in the business of food, beverage options, gaming and retailing of liquor. The company was founded in 2009 and is headquartered in Cremorne, Australia. | Consumer Services |
Centuria Heathley Asset Management Ltd. | |
Lincoln Place (Australia) | |
Centuria Funds Management Ltd.
Centuria Funds Management Ltd. Investment ManagersFinance Centuria Funds Management Ltd. provides fund management services. The private company is based in Sydney, Australia. The CEO of the Australian company is John Edward McBain. | Finance |
- Bourse
- Insiders
- Nicholas Collishaw
- Expérience