Yun Rui Zheng
Director/Board Member chez SINOPEC SHANGHAI PETROCHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED
Profil
Yun Rui Zheng is an Independent Director at Fuxin Dare Automotive Parts Co., Ltd., Wuxi New Hongtai Electrical Technology Co., Ltd., Meilu Biotech Co., Ltd., and Sinopec Shanghai Petrochemical Co., Ltd.
He is also a Professor at East China University of Political Science & Law.
Dr. Zheng previously served as an Independent Director at Gresgying Digital Energy Technology Co., Ltd., Yangzhou Chenhua New Material Co., Ltd., and Hangzhou Innover Technology Co., Ltd.
He was also an Independent Director at Jiangxi Xinyu Guoke Technology Co., Ltd.
from 2015 to 2021 and a Member-Supervisory Board at Zhejiang Reclaim Construction Group Co., Ltd.
from 2019 to 2021.
Dr. Zheng's education includes an undergraduate degree from Shangrao Normal University, a graduate degree from Peking University Law School, and a doctorate from Peking University Law School.
Currently, Dr. Zheng is an Independent Director at Fuxin Dare Automotive Parts Co., Ltd., Wuxi New Hongtai Electrical Technology Co., Ltd., Meilu Biotech Co., Ltd., and Sinopec Shanghai Petrochemical Co., Ltd., and a Professor at East China University of Political Science & Law.
Postes actifs de Yun Rui Zheng
Sociétés | Poste | Début |
---|---|---|
SINOPEC SHANGHAI PETROCHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED | Director/Board Member | 01/12/2014 |
FUXIN DARE AUTOMOTIVE PARTS CO., LTD. | Director/Board Member | 19/03/2018 |
WUXI NEW HONGTAI ELECTRICAL TECHNOLOGY CO.,LTD | Director/Board Member | 02/11/2020 |
East China University of Political Science & Law | Corporate Officer/Principal | - |
Meilu Biotech Co., Ltd.
Meilu Biotech Co., Ltd. Food: Meat/Fish/DairyConsumer Non-Durables Meilu Biotech Co., Ltd. engages in the research and development, production, sale, and service of infant formula milk powder and modified milk powder. It also offers adult milk powder, calcium and iron nutrition milk powder, elderly probiotic nutrition milk powder, and children’s growth milk powder. The company was founded by Lin Chen on November 16, 2001 and is headquartered in Jiujiang, China. | Director/Board Member | 23/08/2017 |
Anciens postes connus de Yun Rui Zheng
Sociétés | Poste | Fin |
---|---|---|
DALIAN INSULATOR GROUP CO., LTD | Director/Board Member | 01/03/2022 |
JIANGXI XINYU GUOKE TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD | Director/Board Member | 01/06/2021 |
ZHEJIANG RECLAIM CONSTRUCTION GROUP CO., LTD. | Director/Board Member | 01/02/2021 |
HANGZHOU INNOVER TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. | Director/Board Member | 01/05/2019 |
░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░ ░░░ ░░░░░░░░ ░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | - |
Formation de Yun Rui Zheng
Shangrao Normal University | Undergraduate Degree |
Peking University Law School | Doctorate Degree |
Expériences
Fonctions occupées
Relations
Relations au 1er degré
Entreprises liées au 1er degré
Homme
Femme
Administrateurs
Exécutifs
Sociétés liées
Sociétés cotées | 9 |
---|---|
SINOPEC SHANGHAI PETROCHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED | Energy Minerals |
GRESGYING DIGITAL ENERGY TECHNOLOGY CO.,LTD | Technology Services |
DALIAN INSULATOR GROUP CO., LTD | Producer Manufacturing |
ZHEJIANG RECLAIM CONSTRUCTION GROUP CO., LTD. | Industrial Services |
FUXIN DARE AUTOMOTIVE PARTS CO., LTD. | Producer Manufacturing |
HANGZHOU INNOVER TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. | Producer Manufacturing |
WUXI NEW HONGTAI ELECTRICAL TECHNOLOGY CO.,LTD | Producer Manufacturing |
YANGZHOU CHENHUA NEW MATERIAL CO., LTD. | Process Industries |
JIANGXI XINYU GUOKE TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD | Electronic Technology |
Entreprise privées | 1 |
---|---|
Meilu Biotech Co., Ltd.
Meilu Biotech Co., Ltd. Food: Meat/Fish/DairyConsumer Non-Durables Meilu Biotech Co., Ltd. engages in the research and development, production, sale, and service of infant formula milk powder and modified milk powder. It also offers adult milk powder, calcium and iron nutrition milk powder, elderly probiotic nutrition milk powder, and children’s growth milk powder. The company was founded by Lin Chen on November 16, 2001 and is headquartered in Jiujiang, China. | Consumer Non-Durables |